NY A06429 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-05 - amend by restoring to original print 6429
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-05 - amend by restoring to original print 6429
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to defining "period of war" for the alternative veterans' exemption; includes more recent hostilities in the definition of "period of war".
Title
Relates to defining "period of war" for the alternative veterans' exemption; includes more recent hostilities in the definition of "period of war".
Sponsors
Asm. Angelo Santabarbara [D] | Asm. Kimberly Jean-Pierre [D] | Asm. Stacey Pheffer Amato [D] | Asm. Marianne Buttenschon [D] |
Asm. Steven Raga [D] | Asm. Michael Reilly [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-05 | Assembly | amend by restoring to original print 6429 |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2023-05-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-05-02 | Assembly | print number 6429a |
2023-05-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to veterans' affairs |
2023-04-06 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S01938 (Same As) 2024-05-28 - referred to ways and means