NY A06392 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Allows donate life registration on electronic applications administered by the office of temporary disability assistance, the higher education services corporation, and on mandatory electronic tax filings and payments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows donate life registration on electronic applications administered by the office of temporary disability assistance, the higher education services corporation, and on mandatory electronic tax filings and payments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-12SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-05-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2021-05-12Senate3RD READING CAL.668
2021-05-12SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5973
2021-05-10SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH
2021-05-10Assemblydelivered to senate
2021-05-10Assemblypassed assembly
2021-05-06Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.327
2021-05-04Assemblyreported
2021-03-17Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S05973 (Same As) 2021-05-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6392

New York State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback