NY A06392 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to housing
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to housing
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the regulation of short-term rental units; authorizes short-term rental units and requires short-term rental hosts to register each unit with the division of housing and community renewal; establishes that occupancies of a short-term rental unit shall be subject to taxes and fees pursuant to articles twenty-eight and twenty-nine of the tax law and applicable local laws.
Title
Relates to the regulation of short-term rental units; authorizes short-term rental units and requires short-term rental hosts to register each unit with the division of housing and community renewal; establishes that occupancies of a short-term rental unit shall be subject to taxes and fees pursuant to articles twenty-eight and twenty-nine of the tax law and applicable local laws.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | print number 6392b |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to housing |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | print number 6392a |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to housing |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S04899 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT