NY A06325 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-11 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-11 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the New York city transit authority and the metropolitan transportation authority to report to the governor and the legislature on service reductions and eliminations.
Title
Directs the New York city transit authority and the metropolitan transportation authority to report to the governor and the legislature on service reductions and eliminations.
Sponsors
Asm. James Brennan [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] | Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] | Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D] |
Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-11 | Senate | tabled |
2015-12-11 | Senate | vetoed memo.282 |
2015-11-30 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-11 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3809A |
2015-05-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | amended on third reading 6325a |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.272 |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | reported |
2015-03-20 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S03809 (Same As) 2015-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6325A