NY A06300 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - signed chap.275
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allows a principal employed by a certain district to make a written request to the board of education for an extended leave of absence to serve as a principal at a charter school.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows a principal employed by a certain district to make a written request to the board of education for an extended leave of absence to serve as a principal at a charter school.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-08-01Senatesigned chap.275
2012-07-20Assemblydelivered to governor
2012-06-21SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-21SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-21Senate3RD READING CAL.502
2012-06-21SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5691B
2012-06-20SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2012-06-20Assemblydelivered to senate
2012-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.445
2012-06-20Assemblyrules report cal.445
2012-06-20Assemblyreported
2012-06-13Assemblyreported referred to rules
2012-05-29Assemblyprint number 6300b
2012-05-29Assemblyamend and recommit to education
2012-01-04Assemblyreferred to education
2011-06-17Assemblyamend and recommit to rules 6300a
2011-06-16Assemblyreported referred to rules
2011-03-11Assemblyreferred to education

Same As/Similar To

S05691 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6300B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06300&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06300&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06300
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06300&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06300A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06300&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06300B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06300&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2011/A6300#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback