NY A06292 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-31 - print number 6292b
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-31 - print number 6292b
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner to publicly publish an annual report on the environmental radiation surveillance program and analyze such report showing trends and cumulative impact, as well as notify other relevant agencies if contamination has exceeded EPA standards for maximum amounts of contamination allowed in drinking water or food.
Title
Directs the commissioner to publicly publish an annual report on the environmental radiation surveillance program and analyze such report showing trends and cumulative impact, as well as notify other relevant agencies if contamination has exceeded EPA standards for maximum amounts of contamination allowed in drinking water or food.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-31 | Assembly | print number 6292b |
2024-01-31 | Assembly | amend and recommit to environmental conservation |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | print number 6292a |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation |
2023-04-03 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S02103 (Same As) 2024-04-16 - DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY