NY A06291 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on December 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-22 - approval memo.69
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on December 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-22 - approval memo.69
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an emergency evacuation plan for individuals with disabilities; establishes $500 fine for a knowing failure to comply with such standards.
Title
Establishes an emergency evacuation plan for individuals with disabilities; establishes $500 fine for a knowing failure to comply with such standards.
Sponsors
Asm. Christopher Burdick [D] | Asm. Harvey Epstein [D] | Asm. Jonathan Rivera [D] | Asm. Inez Dickens [D] |
Asm. Jennifer Lunsford [D] | Asm. Dana Levenberg [D] | Asm. Joseph DeStefano [R] | Asm. Angelo Santabarbara [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly People With Disabilities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly People With Disabilities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-22 | Assembly | approval memo.69 |
2023-12-22 | Assembly | signed chap.745 |
2023-12-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2023-05-30 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-05-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-30 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.197 |
2023-05-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S264A |
2023-05-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.263 |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | rules report cal.263 |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2023-05-12 | Assembly | print number 6291a |
2023-05-12 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to people with disabilities |
2023-04-03 | Assembly | referred to people with disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S00264 (Same As) 2023-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6291A