NY A06254 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.441
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.441
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a landlord depositing security deposits in an interest bearing account shall be entitled to receive as administration expenses a sum equivalent to 20 percent of the interest earned by such security money per annum, but not to exceed one percent per annum of the money so deposited.
Title
Provides that a landlord depositing security deposits in an interest bearing account shall be entitled to receive as administration expenses a sum equivalent to 20 percent of the interest earned by such security money per annum, but not to exceed one percent per annum of the money so deposited.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.441 |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.438 |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2017-03-01 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S03311 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY