NY A06233 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-17 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-17 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits rental vehicle companies from imposing any fees, charges or penalties, other than the actual cost of a toll, on an authorized driver for such driver's use of a rental vehicle.
Title
Prohibits rental vehicle companies from imposing any fees, charges or penalties, other than the actual cost of a toll, on an authorized driver for such driver's use of a rental vehicle.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-07-13 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S01843 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION