NY A06186 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - substituted by s2131a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - substituted by s2131a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring the secretary of state to promulgate regulations requiring real estate brokers to institute standardized operating procedures for the prerequisites prospective homebuyers shall meet prior to receiving any services; allows for a penalty to be imposed on any broker or salesperson who fails to comply with such standardized operating procedures.
Title
Relates to requiring the secretary of state to promulgate regulations requiring real estate brokers to institute standardized operating procedures for the prerequisites prospective homebuyers shall meet prior to receiving any services; allows for a penalty to be imposed on any broker or salesperson who fails to comply with such standardized operating procedures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | Assembly | substituted by s2131a |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.447 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S02131 (Same As) 2021-12-21 - APPROVAL MEMO.80