NY A06180 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the commissioner of health to ensure all home health aides and certified nurse aides employed by home care services agencies receive COVID-19 testing not less than every ten days and that such agencies report the COVID-19 infection rates among employees and clients to the commissioner of health.
Title
Requires the commissioner of health to ensure all home health aides and certified nurse aides employed by home care services agencies receive COVID-19 testing not less than every ten days and that such agencies report the COVID-19 infection rates among employees and clients to the commissioner of health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | print number 6180a |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S07165 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO HEALTH