NY A06167 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-12 - print number 6167b
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-12 - print number 6167b
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the seed-NY investment fund to encourage and facilitate the creation or expansion of regional investment funds for research colleges, high-technology development and local development organizations.
Title
Creates the seed-NY investment fund to encourage and facilitate the creation or expansion of regional investment funds for research colleges, high-technology development and local development organizations.
Sponsors
Asm. Robin Schimminger [D] | Asm. Joseph Morelle [D] | Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] | Asm. William Scarborough [D] |
Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-12 | Assembly | print number 6167b |
2012-01-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to economic development |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-04-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2011-04-04 | Assembly | print number 6167a |
2011-04-04 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to economic development |
2011-03-08 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S04483 (Same As) 2012-01-10 - PRINT NUMBER 4483A