NY A06043 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the fundamental right of the people to have access to public information and to be provided notice of and to attend public meetings.
Title
Creates the fundamental right of the people to have access to public information and to be provided notice of and to attend public meetings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2021-04-01 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2021-03-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S04896 (Same As) 2022-03-01 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY