NY A06022 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires periodic reviews of pending applications for material change in the coverage status of certain matters relative to new health technology assessment or medical evidence.
Title
Requires periodic reviews of pending applications for material change in the coverage status of certain matters relative to new health technology assessment or medical evidence.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Nader Sayegh [D] | Asm. Josh Jensen [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | print number 6022a |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2023-04-18 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S04787 (Same As) 2024-04-02 - AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4787A