NY A06017 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-29 - held for consideration in real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-29 - held for consideration in real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Grants a $100,000 real property tax exemption to conservation clubs and rod and gun clubs owning land acquired prior to January 1, 2011, having an assessed value of $500,000 or less.
Title
Grants a $100,000 real property tax exemption to conservation clubs and rod and gun clubs owning land acquired prior to January 1, 2011, having an assessed value of $500,000 or less.
Sponsors
Asm. Joseph Giglio [R] | Asm. Brian Kolb [R] | Asm. William Barclay [R] | Asm. Philip Palmesano [R] |
Asm. Clifford Crouch [R] | Asm. Stephen Hawley [R] | Asm. Robert Oaks [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-29 | Assembly | held for consideration in real property taxation |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2013-03-13 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S04397 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT