NY A05970 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the department of health to conduct a study relating to opening a new hospital in southeast Queens; requires the department of health to deliver a copy of the findings of the study conducted and any legislative recommendations to the governor and the legislature.
Title
Directs the department of health to conduct a study relating to opening a new hospital in southeast Queens; requires the department of health to deliver a copy of the findings of the study conducted and any legislative recommendations to the governor and the legislature.
Sponsors
Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D] | Asm. David Weprin [D] | Asm. Nily Rozic [D] | Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D] |
Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D] | Asm. Vivian Cook [D] | Asm. Khaleel Anderson [D] | Asm. Steven Raga [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-17 | Assembly | tabled |
2023-11-17 | Assembly | vetoed memo.57 |
2023-11-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2023-06-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-08 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1748 |
2023-06-08 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5712 |
2023-06-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.517 |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | rules report cal.517 |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | reported |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2023-03-24 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S05712 (Same As) 2023-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5970