NY A05961 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-10 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-10 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires children under the age of eighteen to wear protective headgear while skiing or snowboarding; imposes civil fines for violations thereof; applies safety in skiing code requirements to snowboarders and snowboarding.
Title
Requires children under the age of eighteen to wear protective headgear while skiing or snowboarding; imposes civil fines for violations thereof; applies safety in skiing code requirements to snowboarders and snowboarding.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-05-12 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |