NY A05949 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-15 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-15 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that whenever a contiguous property of a college or university contains three hundred or more registrants, the polling place designated for such election district shall be on such contiguous property or at a location approved by the college or university.
Title
Provides that whenever a contiguous property of a college or university contains three hundred or more registrants, the polling place designated for such election district shall be on such contiguous property or at a location approved by the college or university.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-15 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S03092 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS