NY A05944 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-02 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-02 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the commissioner of health to establish means of educating proprietors and employees of public eating establishments about food allergens.
Title
Requires the commissioner of health to establish means of educating proprietors and employees of public eating establishments about food allergens.
Sponsors
Asm. Felix Ortiz [D] | Asm. Michael Benedetto [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. Nick Perry [D] |
Asm. Jose Rivera [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-02 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to health |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S01068 (Same As) 2016-01-26 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE