NY A05921 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-08 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-08 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to notification of rights of victims of domestic violence in criminal and family court proceedings.
Title
Relates to notification of rights of victims of domestic violence in criminal and family court proceedings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.424 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-05-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2017-05-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-05-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.290 |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | reported |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |