NY A05920 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-12 - print number 5920a
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-12 - print number 5920a
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the corporate accountability for tax expenditures act; standardizes applications for state development assistance for empire zone assistance and industrial development agency assistance; requires submission of certain development assistance agreements to the department of taxation and finance; requires recipients of certain development assistance to submit progress reports which include certain information and disclosures; makes certain recapture provisions; and defines relevant terms.
Title
Enacts the corporate accountability for tax expenditures act; standardizes applications for state development assistance for empire zone assistance and industrial development agency assistance; requires submission of certain development assistance agreements to the department of taxation and finance; requires recipients of certain development assistance to submit progress reports which include certain information and disclosures; makes certain recapture provisions; and defines relevant terms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-12 | Assembly | print number 5920a |
2012-01-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2011-03-02 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S00446 (Same As) 2012-03-05 - DEFEATED IN CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS