NY A05917 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-17 - substituted by s993a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-17 - substituted by s993a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits smoking tobacco products in and around after-school programs while such programs are in operation.
Title
Prohibits smoking tobacco products in and around after-school programs while such programs are in operation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-17 | Assembly | substituted by s993a |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.462 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.462 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-05-11 | Assembly | print number 5917a |
2015-05-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S00993 (Same As) 2015-08-13 - SIGNED CHAP.100