NY A05876 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-16 - held for consideration in real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-16 - held for consideration in real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a $500,000 supplemental valuation impact grant to the West Valley central school district for the 2019 - 2020 school year.
Title
Provides a $500,000 supplemental valuation impact grant to the West Valley central school district for the 2019 - 2020 school year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-16 | Assembly | held for consideration in real property taxation |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S00906 (Same As) 2019-01-09 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
S07220 (Same As) 2020-01-10 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
S07220 (Same As) 2020-01-10 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION