NY A05829 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-12 - print number 5829a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-12 - print number 5829a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a school voter registration access program to promote student voter registration and pre-registration.
Title
Establishes a school voter registration access program to promote student voter registration and pre-registration.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-12 | Assembly | print number 5829a |
2022-01-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to education |
2021-02-26 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S00912 (Same As) 2022-02-16 - referred to education