NY A05822 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-20 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-20 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that credits for excess electricity generated by customer-generators subject to net energy metering by an electric corporation or the Long Island power authority may be carried over indefinitely and used against any charges imposed by an electric corporation or the Long Island power authority when the customer-generator uses more electricity than such customer generates; provides for the accounting of credits once every 5 years and the electric corporation or Long Island power authority shall reimburse the customer-generator for the accumulated credits.
Title
Provides that credits for excess electricity generated by customer-generators subject to net energy metering by an electric corporation or the Long Island power authority may be carried over indefinitely and used against any charges imposed by an electric corporation or the Long Island power authority when the customer-generator uses more electricity than such customer generates; provides for the accounting of credits once every 5 years and the electric corporation or Long Island power authority shall reimburse the customer-generator for the accumulated credits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 121 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2014-03-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-03-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.272 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-06-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-04-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.223 |
2013-04-22 | Assembly | reported |
2013-03-06 | Assembly | referred to energy |
Same As/Similar To
S02957 (Same As) 2014-05-28 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE