NY A05821 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-15 - substituted by s3499a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-15 - substituted by s3499a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes town justices in the town of Genesee, in the county of Allegany, to reside outside of such town, so long as such person resides in a town which is in the county of Allegany.
Title
Authorizes town justices in the town of Genesee, in the county of Allegany, to reside outside of such town, so long as such person resides in a town which is in the county of Allegany.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-15 | Assembly | substituted by s3499a |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.218 |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.218 |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-05-31 | Assembly | print number 5821a |
2011-05-31 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2011-03-02 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S03499 (Same As) 2011-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.465