NY A05779 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to changing the definition of elevated blood lead levels from a blood lead level greater than or equal to ten micrograms of lead per deciliter of whole blood to five micrograms of lead per deciliter of whole blood.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to changing the definition of elevated blood lead levels from a blood lead level greater than or equal to ten micrograms of lead per deciliter of whole blood to five micrograms of lead per deciliter of whole blood.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-06SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE
2019-03-06Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-03-06Assemblypassed assembly
2019-03-05Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.37
2019-03-05Assemblyrules report cal.37
2019-03-05Assemblyreported
2019-03-05Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-02-28Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-02-19Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S01028 (Same As) 2019-03-26 - ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.331

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05779&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05779&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05779
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05779&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05779&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05779&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05779&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3

Bill Comments

feedback