NY A05742 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides health insurance coverage upon retirement for certain officers and employees of the NYC transit authority pursuant to provisions of the administrative code of the city of New York.
Title
Provides health insurance coverage upon retirement for certain officers and employees of the NYC transit authority pursuant to provisions of the administrative code of the city of New York.
Sponsors
Asm. Peter Abbate [D] | Asm. Audrey Pheffer [D] | Asm. David Weprin [D] | Asm. William Colton [D] |
Asm. Nicole Malliotakis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-04-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2011-02-28 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S04343 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION