NY A05741 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - print number 5741a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - print number 5741a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the creation of a self-sufficiency standard study regarding how much income is needed for a family of a given composition in a given geographic location to adequately meet its basic needs without public or private assistance.
Title
Relates to the creation of a self-sufficiency standard study regarding how much income is needed for a family of a given composition in a given geographic location to adequately meet its basic needs without public or private assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | Assembly | print number 5741a |
2022-03-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to social services |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
S01812 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE