NY A05725 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-05 - print number 5725b
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-05 - print number 5725b
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides an alternative method for equalization in the Eastport-South Manor central school district in order to provide tax stability.
Title
Provides an alternative method for equalization in the Eastport-South Manor central school district in order to provide tax stability.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-05 | Assembly | print number 5725b |
2012-03-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2011-04-27 | Assembly | print number 5725a |
2011-04-27 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to real property taxation |
2011-02-25 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S04891 (Same As) 2012-03-05 - PRINT NUMBER 4891A