NY A05723 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-01 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-01 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits a landlord to inspect dwellings and exterminate bedbug infestations upon reasonable notice.
Title
Permits a landlord to inspect dwellings and exterminate bedbug infestations upon reasonable notice.
Sponsors
Asm. Earlene Hooper [D] | Asm. Phillip Steck [D] | Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D] | Asm. Michael Miller [D] |
Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D] | Asm. Annette Robinson [D] | Asm. Matthew Titone [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.772 |
2016-05-25 | Assembly | reported |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2015-03-03 | Assembly | referred to housing |