NY A05716 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-03 - SIGNED CHAP.326
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-03 - SIGNED CHAP.326
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing the town of Smithtown, county of Suffolk, to alienate and convey certain parcels of land used as parklands to facilitate the placement and operation of a sewer pump station.
Title
Relates to authorizing the town of Smithtown, county of Suffolk, to alienate and convey certain parcels of land used as parklands to facilitate the placement and operation of a sewer pump station.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-03 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.326 |
2019-10-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-04 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-04 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-04 | Senate | home rule request |
2019-06-04 | Senate | home rule request |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.522 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | substituted for a5716 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-06 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.205 |
2019-01-30 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | substituted by s2859 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.522 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S02859 (Same As) 2019-10-03 - SIGNED CHAP.326