NY A05692 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.158
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires owners of housing accommodations subject to rent registration to file an additional statement at three month intervals, until the unit is occupied.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires owners of housing accommodations subject to rent registration to file an additional statement at three month intervals, until the unit is occupied.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-28 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.158
2023-03-30Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.116
2023-03-28Assemblyreported
2023-03-22Assemblyreferred to housing

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback