NY A05496 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to cyber crimes and identity theft; increases penalties for certain acts involving use of personal information, fraud, tampering, theft and use of a computer to commit crimes.
Title
Relates to cyber crimes and identity theft; increases penalties for certain acts involving use of personal information, fraud, tampering, theft and use of a computer to commit crimes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | print number 5496a |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2017-02-09 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S02406 (Same As) 2018-06-11 - referred to codes