NY A05481 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s3283
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s3283
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends from November 30, 2015 to November 30, 2017, the authorization granted to the county of Tioga to impose an additional one percent of sales and compensating use taxes.
Title
Extends from November 30, 2015 to November 30, 2017, the authorization granted to the county of Tioga to impose an additional one percent of sales and compensating use taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s3283 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.647 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-02-24 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S03283 (Same As) 2015-09-25 - SIGNED CHAP.282