NY A05439 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-07 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-07 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the office of victims services to consult with the office for the aging in establishing a program for home visitation for elderly and invalid victims of violent crime.
Title
Directs the office of victims services to consult with the office for the aging in establishing a program for home visitation for elderly and invalid victims of violent crime.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2012-02-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-02-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.183 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-01-04 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2011-03-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2011-03-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-03-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-03-10 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.121 |
2011-03-09 | Assembly | reported |
2011-02-18 | Assembly | referred to aging |
Same As/Similar To
S03559 (Same As) 2012-03-07 - DEFEATED IN CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION