NY A05423 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-01 - substituted by s2767a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-01 - substituted by s2767a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a private student loan refinance task force to study and report on ways lending institutions offering private student loans to graduates of institutions of higher education can be encouraged to establish student loan refinancing programs.
Title
Establishes a private student loan refinance task force to study and report on ways lending institutions offering private student loans to graduates of institutions of higher education can be encouraged to establish student loan refinancing programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Assembly | substituted by s2767a |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.186 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | print number 5423a |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2021-02-16 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S02767 (Same As) 2021-12-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.132