NY A05419 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the city of Oneida to set the fee for birth and death records.
Title
Authorizes the city of Oneida to set the fee for birth and death records.
Sponsors
Asm. John Salka [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 124 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-02-26 | Assembly | amended on third reading (t) 5419a |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.206 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.517 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-12 | Assembly | referred to health |