NY A05363 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - held for consideration in governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - held for consideration in governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the power of county legislatures to preempt or supercede state laws.
Title
Relates to the power of county legislatures to preempt or supercede state laws.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Assembly | held for consideration in governmental operations |
2020-02-14 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |