NY A05307 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-21 - print number 5307a
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-21 - print number 5307a
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the submission of electronic bids in the awarding of certain contracts in the village of Port Chester and the city of New Rochelle.
Title
Relates to the submission of electronic bids in the awarding of certain contracts in the village of Port Chester and the city of New Rochelle.
Sponsors
Asm. Steven Otis [D] | Asm. Amy Paulin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-21 | Assembly | print number 5307a |
2014-01-21 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S02055 (Same As) 2014-01-13 - PRINT NUMBER 2055A