NY A05245 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-29 - approval memo.12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-29 - approval memo.12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the issuance of bonds to finance airport improvements at the East Hampton Airport for a period not to exceed 30 years.
Title
Relates to the issuance of bonds to finance airport improvements at the East Hampton Airport for a period not to exceed 30 years.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-29 | Senate | approval memo.12 |
2016-11-28 | Senate | signed chap.446 |
2016-11-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-16 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2016-06-16 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1933 |
2016-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3690 |
2016-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | home rule request |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.226 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.226 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2015-02-13 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S03690 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5245