NY A05144 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for cost allowances for strategic capital investments in technology infrastructure for certain home health care programs.
Title
Provides for cost allowances for strategic capital investments in technology infrastructure for certain home health care programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-01 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2014-02-04 | Assembly | print number 5144a |
2014-02-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2013-02-20 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S06439 (Same As) 2014-01-24 - REFERRED TO HEALTH