NY A05127 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.359
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.359
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires pre-admission notification of policies authorizing the refusal to follow directives in health care proxies that are contrary to a hospital's operating principles.
Title
Requires pre-admission notification of policies authorizing the refusal to follow directives in health care proxies that are contrary to a hospital's operating principles.
Sponsors
Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Harry Bronson [D] | Asm. Deborah Glick [D] |
Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.359 |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.111 |
2017-03-01 | Assembly | reported |
2017-02-06 | Assembly | referred to health |