NY A05127 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-01 - held for consideration in governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-01 - held for consideration in governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires fiscal impact notes on bills affecting political subdivisions including identifying a source of funding for the annual cost of the legislation.
Title
Requires fiscal impact notes on bills affecting political subdivisions including identifying a source of funding for the annual cost of the legislation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | Assembly | held for consideration in governmental operations |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | motion to discharge lost |
2015-02-12 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S04272 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS