NY A05098 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 74-1)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-02 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-02 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes tuition free for New York state residents at SUNY and CUNY schools and community colleges; requires community service and state residency and employment for a period of five years after completion of academic program.
Title
Makes tuition free for New York state residents at SUNY and CUNY schools and community colleges; requires community service and state residency and employment for a period of five years after completion of academic program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | print number 5098a |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-02-12 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S04760 (Same As) 2016-01-22 - PRINT NUMBER 4760B