NY A05068 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-05 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-05 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for early voting at presidential elections.
Title
Provides for early voting at presidential elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-05 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2016-01-13 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2015-03-06 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2015-02-13 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2015-02-12 | Assembly | referred to election law |