NY A05058 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - advanced to third reading cal.787
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - advanced to third reading cal.787
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Sets forth provisions for absentee ballots for fire district elections and improvement district elections.
Title
Sets forth provisions for absentee ballots for fire district elections and improvement district elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.787 |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2017-02-06 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S03047 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT