NY A04990 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.191
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.191
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the sale of electric assisted bicycles unless the packaging contains a notice stating that the operation of such electric assisted bicycle on any public highway, road or sidewalk may be unlawful.
Title
Prohibits the sale of electric assisted bicycles unless the packaging contains a notice stating that the operation of such electric assisted bicycle on any public highway, road or sidewalk may be unlawful.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.191 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.297 |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | reported |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-02-06 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S04621 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION