NY A04963 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-31 - signed chap.193
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-31 - signed chap.193
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Ticonderoga to offer a 20 year retirement plan to police officer Dale W. Quesnel, Jr.
Title
Authorizes the town of Ticonderoga to offer a 20 year retirement plan to police officer Dale W. Quesnel, Jr.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Stec [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-31 | Senate | signed chap.193 |
2013-07-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2013-06-13 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-13 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2013-06-13 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.380 |
2013-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3182 |
2013-06-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | home rule request |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.107 |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.107 |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-02-13 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S03182 (Same As) 2013-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4963