NY A04963 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-22 - print number 4963a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-22 - print number 4963a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
This bill requires notification of alien defendants during the plea process that pleading. guilty to a misdemeanor or violation may subject them to automatic removal (deportation) or denial of naturalization.
Title
Requires courts, prior to accepting a plea to a misdemeanor or violation, to provide notice to the defendant that such plea and the acceptance thereof could result in deportation, removal from the United States, exclusion from the United States or denial of citizenship, if the defendant is not a citizen of the United States.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-22 | print number 4963a | |
2010-02-22 | amend and recommit to codes | |
2010-01-06 | referred to codes | |
2009-02-10 | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S4399-A (Same As) 2010-03-01 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING